US HB1268 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-7)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Bureau of Reclamation Transparency Act This bill directs the Department of the Interior to publish, and update every two years, an Asset Management Report. The report must describe the Bureau of Reclamation's efforts to (1) maintain in a reliable manner its reserved works (e.g., buildings, structures, facilities, or equipment); and (2) standardize and streamline data reporting and processes across regions and areas for the purpose of maintaining reserved works. The report must include (1) an assessment of major repair and rehabilitation needs for reserved works, and (2) an itemized and prioritized list of major repair and rehabilitation needs of individual facilities. Interior must coordinate with the nonfederal entities responsible for the operation and maintenance of Reclamation facilities, known as transferred works, in developing reporting requirements for their major repair and rehabilitation needs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bureau of Reclamation Transparency Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-02-14HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB40 (Related) 2019-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback