US HB1264 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-03 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 683.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-03 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 683.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Community Financial Institution Exemption Act This bill amends the Consumer Financial Protection Act of 2010 to exempt certain financial institutions from all rules and regulations issued by the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (CFPB). Specifically, the bill exempts from regulation an insured depository institution or credit union with less than $50 billion in consolidated assets. Under specified circumstances, and with the written agreement of the Federal Reserve Board and other specified federal banking agencies, the CFPB may revoke such an exemption with respect to a certain rule or regulation and a specific class of institutions.
Title
Community Financial Institution Exemption Act
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. John Culberson [R-TX] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] |
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] |
Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI] | Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] |
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. David Trott [R-MI] | Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] |
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] | Rep. John Carter [R-TX] |
Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Joe Barton [R-TX] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] |
Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] |
Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 683. |
2018-08-03 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-885. |
2018-01-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 30 - 25. |
2018-01-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-01-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-01-09 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral. |
2017-02-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Finance and financial sector
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Finance and financial sector