US HB1262 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a task force on improvements for certain notices to airmen, and for other purposes.
Title
Notice to Airmen Improvement Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2021-06-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-06-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2771) |
2021-06-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1262. |
2021-06-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2771-2772) |
2021-06-15 | House | Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-05-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 26. |
2021-05-28 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 117-43. |
2021-03-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-03-24 | House | Subcommittee on Aviation Discharged. |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced in House |