US HB1259 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Helping Expand Lending Practices in Rural Communities Act (Sec. 2) Directs the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (CFPB) to establish an application process under which a person who lives or does business in a state may apply to have an area in the state identified as a rural area if it has not yet been so designated by the CFPB for purposes of federal consumer financial law. Prescribes criteria for the CFPB to consider when evaluating the application. Requires the CFPB to: (1) grant or deny the application within 90 days after the public comment period ends; and (2) publish the grant or denial in the Federal Register, including an explanation of the factors upon which the CFPB relied in making its determination. Sunsets this Act two years after its enactment.
Title
Helping Expand Lending Practices in Rural Communities Act
Sponsors
Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] | Rep. Randy Neugebauer [R-TX] | Rep. French Hill [R-AR] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 401 N: 1 NV: 29 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2015-04-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-04-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 1 (Roll no. 145). (text: CR H2122) |
2015-04-13 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2127) |
2015-04-13 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2015-04-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1259. |
2015-04-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2121-2123) |
2015-04-13 | House | Mr. Neugebauer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 41. |
2015-04-13 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-60. |
2015-03-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 56 - 2. |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-03-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB871 (Related) 2015-03-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2048-2049)
HB1389 (Related) 2015-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
SB1910 (Related) 2015-07-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 176.
SB2132 (Related) 2015-10-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 251.
HB1389 (Related) 2015-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
SB1910 (Related) 2015-07-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 176.
SB2132 (Related) 2015-10-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 251.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Finance and financial sector
Rural conditions and development
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Finance and financial sector
Rural conditions and development