US HB1258 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 179-44-1-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pet and Women Safety Act of 2015 Amends the federal criminal code to prohibit threats or acts of violence against a person's pet under the offenses of stalking and interstate violation of a protection order. Defines "pet" to mean a domesticated animal that is kept for pleasure rather than for commercial purposes. Requires the "full amount of the victim's losses" for purposes of restitution in domestic violence and stalking offenses to include any costs incurred for veterinary services relating to physical care for the victim's pet. Directs the Department of Agriculture to award grants to eligible entities to carry out programs to provide specified housing assistance, support services, and training of relevant stakeholders to victims of domestic violence, dating violence, sexual assault, or stalking and their pets. Expresses the sense of Congress that states should encourage the inclusion of protections against violent or threatening acts against the pet of the person in domestic violence protection orders.
Title
Pet and Women Safety Act of 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture. |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1559 (Same As) 2015-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Subjects
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Assault and harassment offenses
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against animals and natural resources
Crimes against women
Domestic violence and child abuse
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Sex offenses
Veterinary medicine and animal diseases
Violent crime
Assault and harassment offenses
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against animals and natural resources
Crimes against women
Domestic violence and child abuse
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Sex offenses
Veterinary medicine and animal diseases
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1258/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1258/BILLS-114hr1258ih.pdf |