US HB1251 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-2)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CPI-E Act of 2017 This bill bases cost-of -living increases in benefits under the Civil Service Retirement System, the Federal Employees Retirement System, military retirement and survivor benefit programs, the Social Security old-age, survivors, or disability insurance benefit program, and other specified veterans benefits programs on increases in the Consumer Price Index for the elderly.
Title
CPI-E Act of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security. |
2017-02-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, Oversight and Government Reform, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, Oversight and Government Reform, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, Oversight and Government Reform, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, Oversight and Government Reform, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, Oversight and Government Reform, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Aging
Disability assistance
Economics and public finance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Inflation and prices
Military personnel and dependents
Social security and elderly assistance
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Disability assistance
Economics and public finance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Inflation and prices
Military personnel and dependents
Social security and elderly assistance
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1251/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1251/BILLS-115hr1251ih.pdf |