US HB1247 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-16)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Improving Veterans Access to Quality Care Act of 2015 Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to revive, for a three-year period, VA's Intermediate Care Technician Pilot Program that was carried out between January 2013 and February 2014. Requires VA to: (1) expand the pilot program to include at least 250 intermediate care technicians, and (2) give priority in assigning those technicians to VA facilities at which veterans have the longest wait times. Requires the Secretary of Defense (DOD) to transfer credentialing data regarding DOD health care providers that are hired by VA to VA. Authorizes VA to allow a covered nurse to practice to the full scope of the nurse's practice, as defined by the applicable national professional association, under a set of VA-approved privileges, regardless of the state in which VA employs the covered nurse. Defines a "covered nurse" as an advanced practice registered nurse who is employed by VA as: (1) a nurse midwife, (2) a clinical nurse specialist, (3) a nurse practitioner, or (4) a certified registered nurse anesthetist.
Title
Improving Veterans Access to Quality Care Act of 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB297 (Related) 2015-06-03 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health personnel
Hospital care
Licensing and registrations
Nursing
Veterans' medical care
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health personnel
Hospital care
Licensing and registrations
Nursing
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1247/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1247/BILLS-114hr1247ih.pdf |