US HB1242 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Defense Intelligence and Overhead Architecture.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Defense Intelligence and Overhead Architecture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Defense Intelligence and Overhead Architecture.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Defense Intelligence and Overhead Architecture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To make improvements to the role of the Department of Defense in responding to domestic emergencies, including wildfires.
Title
Military Support for Fighting Wildfires Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] |
Rep. Sara Jacobs [D-CA] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Defense Intelligence and Overhead Architecture. |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry. |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2023-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Transportation and Infrastructure, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-02-28 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E162-163) |
2023-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/1242/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr1242/BILLS-118hr1242ih.pdf |