US HB1238 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Became Public Law No: 115-43.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Securing our Agriculture and Food Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to direct the Assistant Secretary for Health Affairs for the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to carry out a program to coordinate DHS efforts related to defending the food, agriculture, and veterinary systems of the United States against terrorism and other high-consequence events that pose a high risk to homeland security. Such program shall: provide oversight and management of DHS's responsibilities pursuant to Homeland Security Presidential Directive 9 - Defense of United States Agriculture and Food; provide oversight and integration of DHS activities related to veterinary public health, food defense, and agricultural security; lead DHS policy initiatives related to food, animal, and agricultural incidents and to overall domestic preparedness for, and collective response to, agricultural terrorism; coordinate with other DHS components on activities related to food and agriculture security and screening procedures for domestic and imported products; and coordinate with appropriate federal departments and agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Securing our Agriculture and Food Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-22 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 406 N: 6 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-30SenateBecame Public Law No: 115-43.
2017-06-30SenateSigned by President.
2017-06-27SenatePresented to President.
2017-06-20SenateMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-06-20SenateOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate amendments: CR H4974-4975)
2017-06-20SenateMr. Katko asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and agree to the Senate amendments. (consideration: CR H4974-4975)
2017-05-25SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2017-05-24SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.
2017-05-24SenateS.Amdt.217 Amendment SA 217 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2017-05-24SenateS.Amdt.217 Amendment SA 217 proposed by Senator Sullivan for Senator Roberts. (consideration: CR S3151-3152; text: CR S3151-3152)
2017-05-24SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3151-3152)
2017-05-24SenateSenate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2017-03-23SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2017-03-22HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-03-22HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 6 (Roll no. 187). (text: CR H2304-2305)
2017-03-22HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2330-2331)
2017-03-22HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2017-03-22HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1238.
2017-03-22HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2304-2307)
2017-03-22HouseMr. Donovan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2017-03-16HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 22.
2017-03-16HouseCommittee on Agriculture discharged.
2017-03-16HouseCommittee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
2017-03-16HouseReported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-42, Part I.
2017-03-08HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2017-03-08HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-03-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2017-02-28HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-02-28HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-02-28HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-02-28HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-02-28HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB500 (Related) 2017-04-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 38.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback