US HB1236 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 210-2)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 16.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 16.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses extreme risk protection order laws. Extreme risk protection order laws, or red flag laws, generally allow certain individuals (e.g., law enforcement officers or family members) to petition a court for a temporary order that prohibits an at-risk individual from purchasing and possessing firearms. First, the bill establishes a grant program to help states and Indian tribes implement extreme risk protection order laws and carry out related activities. Local governments and other entities may also receive grants to carry out certain activities, such as raising public awareness of extreme risk protection order laws. Further, grant recipients must use a specified portion of funds to provide training for law enforcement. In addition, the bill expands the categories of persons who are prohibited from receiving, possessing, shipping, or transporting a firearm or ammunition to include persons who are subject to an extreme risk protection order.
Title
Extreme Risk Protection Order Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 16. |
2019-09-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-10 | House | Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged. |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB506 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3254 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5717 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB4271 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3254 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5717 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB4271 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Due process and equal protection
Firearms and explosives
Judges
Judicial procedure and administration
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Mental health
Retail and wholesale trades
State and local government operations
Due process and equal protection
Firearms and explosives
Judges
Judicial procedure and administration
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Mental health
Retail and wholesale trades
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1236/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1236/BILLS-116hr1236ih.pdf |