US HB123 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 547.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 547.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes a pilot program for an alternative credit rating system for use by mortgage lenders. Specifically, the program provides credit information about borrowers who have insufficient credit histories for purposes of determining their creditworthiness for mortgages insured by the Federal Housing Administration.
Title
Alternative Data for Additional Credit FHA Pilot Program Reauthorization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 547. |
2020-12-17 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-663. |
2019-09-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 22. |
2019-09-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Consumer credit
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Housing and community development
Housing finance and home ownership
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Housing and community development
Housing finance and home ownership