US HB1226 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ACE Kids Act of 2019 Advancing Care for Exceptional Kids Act of 2019 This bill establishes a state Medicaid option to provide for medical assistance with respect to coordinated care provided through a health home (i.e., a designated provider or team of health-care professionals) for children with medically complex conditions. States must determine payment methodologies in accordance with specified requirements; payments also temporarily qualify for an enhanced federal matching rate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ACE Kids Act of 2019 Advancing Care for Exceptional Kids Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-02-14HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB317 (Related) 2019-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1839 (Related) 2019-04-18 - Became Public Law No: 116-16.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback