US HB1226 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a state Medicaid option to provide for medical assistance with respect to coordinated care provided through a health home (i.e., a designated provider or team of health-care professionals) for children with medically complex conditions. States must determine payment methodologies in accordance with specified requirements; payments also temporarily qualify for an enhanced federal matching rate.
Title
ACE Kids Act of 2019 Advancing Care for Exceptional Kids Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] |
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] |
Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] |
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] |
Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Rep. George Holding [R-NC] | Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] |
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] |
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] |
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB317 (Related) 2019-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1839 (Related) 2019-04-18 - Became Public Law No: 116-16. (TXT | PDF)
HB1839 (Related) 2019-04-18 - Became Public Law No: 116-16. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Birth defects
Blood and blood diseases
Child health
Disability and paralysis
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Family services
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
HIV/AIDS
Home and outpatient care
Hospital care
Medicaid
Mental health
Musculoskeletal and skin diseases
Neurological disorders
State and local government operations
Blood and blood diseases
Child health
Disability and paralysis
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Family services
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
HIV/AIDS
Home and outpatient care
Hospital care
Medicaid
Mental health
Musculoskeletal and skin diseases
Neurological disorders
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1226/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1226/BILLS-116hr1226ih.pdf |