US HB1225 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 201-129)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 199.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 199.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the National Park Service and Public Lands Legacy Restoration Fund into which, through FY2024, there shall be deposited an amount equal to 50% of all energy development revenues due and payable to the federal government from oil, gas, coal, or alternative or renewable energy development on federal lands and waters that would otherwise be credited, covered, or deposited as miscellaneous receipts under federal law. Deposited amounts must not exceed $1.3 billion for any such fiscal year. From such amounts 80% shall be allocated to the National Park Service for priority deferred maintenance projects, ensuring parity between transportation and nontransportation projects; 10% shall be allocated for the national wildlife refuge system maintenance backlog; 5% shall be allocated for addressing the public access and recreation backlog on public lands; and 5% shall be allocated for addressing the Bureau of Indian Education school construction and deferred maintenance backlogs. The Department of the Interior must take into consideration the projected lifespan of any projects under this bill when prioritizing which of those projects to fund. No more than 10% of amounts in the fund may be used for administrative costs. None of the amounts in the fund may be used for the acquisition of land or for supplanting discretionary funding for annually recurring facility operations, maintenance, and construction needs. Interior must submit to Congress, with the President's annual budget submission, a list of projects receiving allocations from the fund and a description of each such project. Interior, and other specified agencies, may accept cash or in-kind donations that advance efforts to reduce maintenance backlogs and encourage public-private partnerships.
Title
Restore Our Parks and Public Lands Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 199. |
2019-10-22 | House | Committee on Education and Labor discharged. |
2019-10-22 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-250, Part I. |
2019-06-26 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2019-06-26 | House | Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged. |
2019-06-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 36 - 2. |
2019-06-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-26 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1026 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
SB500 (Related) 2020-02-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 428.
SB2783 (Related) 2019-11-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB500 (Related) 2020-02-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 428.
SB2783 (Related) 2019-11-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Charitable contributions
Coal
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Educational facilities and institutions
Energy revenues and royalties
Executive agency funding and structure
Government trust funds
Historic sites and heritage areas
Indian social and development programs
Legislative rules and procedure
Minority education
Oil and gas
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Roads and highways
Transportation programs funding
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Charitable contributions
Coal
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Educational facilities and institutions
Energy revenues and royalties
Executive agency funding and structure
Government trust funds
Historic sites and heritage areas
Indian social and development programs
Legislative rules and procedure
Minority education
Oil and gas
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Roads and highways
Transportation programs funding
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats