US HB1223 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To impose sanctions with respect to individuals associated with the Government of the Russian Federation who are complicit in the poisoning and repression of citizens of the Russian Federation for political motives, and for other purposes.
Title
Holding Russia Accountable for Malign Activities Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] | Rep. Peter Meijer [R-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB208 (Same As) 2021-02-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1223/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1223/BILLS-117hr1223ih.pdf |