US HB1222 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-11)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gold Star Fathers Act Includes as a preference eligible for federal employment purposes a parent (currently, the mother only) of either an individual who lost his or her life under honorable conditions while serving in the Armed Forces during a war, in a campaign or expedition for which a campaign badge has been authorized, or during the period beginning April 28, 1952, and ending July 1, 1955, or a service-connected permanently and totally disabled veteran, if: (1) the spouse of such parent is totally and permanently disabled; or (2) such parent, when preference is claimed, is unmarried or legally separated from his or her spouse.
Title
Gold Star Fathers Act
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] | Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] |
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] |
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] |
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] |
Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Ryan Zinke [R-MT] | Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D-IL] |
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Robert Dold [R-IL] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] |
Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB136 (Related) 2015-10-07 - Became Public Law No: 114-62. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Disability and paralysis
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Marriage and family status
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Disability and paralysis
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Marriage and family status
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1222/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1222/BILLS-114hr1222ih.pdf |