US HB1212 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 55-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Internet Freedom Act Nullifies the rule adopted by the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) on February 26, 2015, relating to the reclassification of broadband Internet access service as a telecommunications service. Prohibits the FCC from reissuing such rule in substantially the same form, or from issuing a new rule that is substantially the same, unless the rule is specifically authorized by a law enacted after enactment of this Act. Exempts any rule that the FCC determines is necessary for national security, public safety, or assistance to law enforcement.
Title
Internet Freedom Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HJR42 (Related) 2015-04-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
SB2602 (Related) 2016-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2602 (Related) 2016-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Competition and antitrust
Consumer affairs
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Competition and antitrust
Consumer affairs
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1212/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1212/BILLS-114hr1212ih.pdf |