US HB1209 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-11)
Status: Passed on December 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-06 - Became Public Law No: 115-284.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-11)
Status: Passed on December 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-06 - Became Public Law No: 115-284.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 901 N. Francisco Avenue, Mission, Texas, as the "Mission Veterans Post Office Building". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 901 N. Francisco Avenue, Mission, Texas, as the "Mission Veterans Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 901 N. Francisco Avenue, Mission, Texas, as the "Mission Veterans Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] |
Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] | Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. Jeb Hensarling [R-TX] |
Rep. Joe Barton [R-TX] | Rep. John Culberson [R-TX] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] |
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] | Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX] | Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] |
Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] |
Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-06 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-284. |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-11-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7063) |
2018-09-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 593. |
2018-09-28 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report. |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-03-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-03-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1347) |
2018-03-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1209. |
2018-03-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1347-1348) |
2018-03-05 | House | Mr. Palmer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-09-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-09-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2017-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Texas
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Texas
Veterans' organizations and recognition