US HB1204 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-01 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 95.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-01 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 95.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the District of Columbia Home Rule Act to permit the District of Columbia to establish the rate of pay of the Chief Financial Officer of the District of Columbia.
Title
District of Columbia Chief Financial Officer Salary Home Rule Act
Sponsors
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-29 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 259 N: 170 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-01 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 95. |
2021-10-01 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Reform. H. Rept. 117-134. |
2021-09-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 259 - 170 (Roll no. 308). (text: CR 7/26/2021 H3877) |
2021-09-29 | House | Failed of passage/not agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 259 - 170 (Roll no. 308). (text: CR 7/26/2021 H3877) |
2021-09-29 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5547) |
2021-07-26 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-07-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1204. |
2021-07-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3877-3878) |
2021-07-26 | House | Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-06-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-06-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2021-02-22 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E150) |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |