US HB1199 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to ensure equitable payment for, and preserve Medicare beneficiary access to, diagnostic radiopharmaceuticals under the Medicare hospital outpatient prospective payment system.
Title
Facilitating Innovative Nuclear Diagnostics Act of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote. |
2024-05-16 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-03-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-02-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1544 (Same As) 2023-05-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/1199/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr1199/BILLS-118hr1199ih.pdf |