US HB1193 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 114-70)
Status: Passed on December 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 117-244.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 114-70)
Status: Passed on December 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 117-244.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title IV of the Public Health Service Act to direct the Director of the National Institutes of Health, in consultation with the Director of the National Heart, Lung, and Blood Institute, shall establish a program under which the Director of the National Institutes of Health shall support or conduct research on valvular heart disease, and for other purposes.
Title
Cardiovascular Advances in Research and Opportunities Legacy Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-20 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-244. |
2022-12-20 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-12-16 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-12-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-05 | House | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8755) |
2022-12-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the Senate amendment to H.R. 1193. |
2022-12-05 | House | Mr. Pallone moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H8755-8756) |
2022-12-05 | House | Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S6947) |
2022-12-01 | Senate | S.Amdt.6504 Amendment SA 6504 proposed by Senator King for Senator McConnell. (consideration: CR S6947; text: CR S6947) In the nature of a substitute. |
2022-12-01 | Senate | S.Amdt.6504 Amendment SA 6504 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-12-01 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6946-6947) |
2022-07-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 443. |
2022-07-12 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Murray with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2021-12-08 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2021-12-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-12-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7518) |
2021-12-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1193. |
2021-12-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7518-7522) |
2021-12-08 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-12-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 153. |
2021-12-08 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-212. |
2021-11-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-11-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-11-04 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2021-11-04 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1133 (Related) 2021-04-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1984; text: CR S1985)