US HB1184 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-3)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Every Kid Outdoors Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Every Kid Outdoors Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
2019-02-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2019-02-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback