US HB1179 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-13)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Interior to establish the U.S. African-American Burial Grounds Network within the National Park Service (NPS). In carrying out the network, Interior, among other things, must review existing and new studies and reports to inform consideration of sites for the network; furnish specified technical assistance; develop a program to train states, units of local government, regional governmental bodies, organizations, educational institutions, and private entities to carry out the purposes of this bill; and produce and disseminate educational and training materials related to African-American burial ground identification methods and best practices for caring for artifacts, developing interpretive tours and exhibits, preserving burial ground landscapes, heritage tourism initiatives and sources for grants (e.g., handbooks, maps, interpretive guides, or electronic information). A burial ground shall only be considered for addition to the network with the property owner's consent and at the request of an individual, landowner, private or nonprofit organization, state or local government, or another entity.
Title
African-American Burial Grounds Network Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2827 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Cemeteries and funerals
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Racial and ethnic relations
Research administration and funding
U.S. history
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Racial and ethnic relations
Research administration and funding
U.S. history
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1179/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1179/BILLS-116hr1179ih.pdf |