US HB1177 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 154-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide an earned path to citizenship, to address the root causes of migration and responsibly manage the southern border, and to reform the immigrant visa system, and for other purposes.
Title
U.S. Citizenship Act Filipino Veterans Family Reunification Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations. |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Armed Services, Education and Labor, House Administration, Financial Services, Natural Resources, Oversight and Reform, Foreign Affairs, Homeland Security, Intelligence (Permanent Select), and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB348 (Same As) 2021-02-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1514 (Related) 2021-04-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB1515 (Related) 2021-04-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB3493 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB5517 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB2954 (Related) 2021-10-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7001)
SB1514 (Related) 2021-04-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB1515 (Related) 2021-04-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB3493 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB5517 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB2954 (Related) 2021-10-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7001)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1177/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1177/BILLS-117hr1177ih.pdf |