US HB1177 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Became Public Law No: 115-156. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Removing Outdated Restrictions to Allow for Job Growth Act (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Agriculture, if requested in writing by the city of Old Town, Maine, to release, convey, and quitclaim to the city, without monetary consideration, all rights, title, and interest of the United States in and to lands that: (1) were conveyed by the federal government to the city under the Bankhead-Jones Farm Tenant Act by the deed dated June 5, 1941, and (2) are proposed for conveyance by the city for the purpose of economic development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removing Outdated Restrictions to Allow for Job Growth Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 262 (Y: 418 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26SenateBecame Public Law No: 115-156. (TXT | PDF)
2018-03-26SenateSigned by President.
2018-03-15SenatePresented to President.
2018-03-09SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-03-08SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
2018-03-08SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1615)
2017-05-18SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
2017-05-17HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-05-17HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 418 - 1 (Roll no. 262). (text: CR H4273)
2017-05-17HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4293-4295)
2017-05-17HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2017-05-17HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1177.
2017-05-17HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4273-4274)
2017-05-17HouseMr. Davis, Rodney moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2017-05-16HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 77.
2017-05-16HouseReported by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 115-124.
2017-05-03HouseOrdered to be Reported.
2017-05-03HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-02-16HouseReferred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
2017-02-16HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB715 (Same As) 2017-03-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB2099 (Related) 2017-11-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 262.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback