US HB1176 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-07-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-07-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Taiwan Allies International Protection and Enhancement Initiative (TAIPEI) Act of 2019 to provide that the United States, as a member of any international organizations, should oppose any attempts by the People's Republic of China to resolve Taiwan's status by distorting the decisions, language, policies, or procedures of the organization, and for other purposes.
Title
Taiwan International Solidarity Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Sen. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] |
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Lisa McClain [R-MI] |
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2023-07-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-07-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3913) |
2023-07-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1176. |
2023-07-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3913-3915) |
2023-07-25 | House | Mr. Barr moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2023-05-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2023-05-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2023-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2995 (Same As) 2023-09-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.