US HB1170 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-11)
Status: Engrossed on October 21 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 186.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1 League in Irvine, California, as the Tuskegee Airman Lieutenant Colonel Robert J. Friend Memorial Post Office Building.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1 League in Irvine, California, as the "Tuskegee Airman Lieutenant Colonel Robert J. Friend Memorial Post Office Building". To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1 League in Irvine, California, as the Tuskegee Airman Lieutenant Colonel Robert J. Friend Memorial Post Office Building.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-16SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 186.
2021-12-16SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. Without written report.
2021-12-15SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2021-10-21SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2021-10-20HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-10-20HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5691)
2021-10-20HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1170.
2021-10-20HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5691-5692)
2021-10-20HouseMrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2021-04-14HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2021-04-14HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-02-18HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
2021-02-18HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback