US HB1166 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-20)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

USE IT Act Utilizing Significant Emissions with Innovative Technologies Act This bill addresses the capture, utilization, and sequestration of carbon dioxide. The Environmental Protection Agency must (1) establish a competitive prize program for certain technology projects that capture carbon dioxide directly from the air, (2) research and develop technologies or approaches that transform carbon dioxide generated by industrial processes into a product of commercial value, and (3) support research and infrastructure activities relating to carbon dioxide utilization by providing technical and financial assistance. The bill includes the construction of infrastructure for carbon capture (e.g., carbon dioxide pipelines) among those projects subject to performance schedules designed to reduce permitting and project delivery time. The Government Accountability Office must issue a report that identifies grant programs that research carbon capture and utilization technologies and examines whether the programs overlap. The Council on Environmental Quality (CEQ) must publish guidance to (1) facilitate reviews associated with the deployment of carbon capture, utilization, and sequestration projects and carbon dioxide pipelines; and (2) support the development of such projects and pipelines. The CEQ must also establish at least two task forces to (1) identify challenges and successes that permitting authorities and project developers and operators face, and (2) improve the performance of the permitting process and regional coordination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

USE IT Act Utilizing Significant Emissions with Innovative Technologies Act

Sponsors

Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ]
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]
Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]
Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]
Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE]Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]
Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]
Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]
Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]
Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD]Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC]
Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN]Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI]
Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT]
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]
Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-02-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
2019-02-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
2019-02-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
2019-02-13HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
2019-02-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB383 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-38.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92.
SB2302 (Related) 2020-01-08 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-200.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB5865 (Related) 2020-02-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback