US HB1164 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 156-14)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-12-07 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 278.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Taylor Force Act This bill prohibits certain assistance under the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 from being made available for the West Bank and Gaza unless the Department of State certifies that the Palestinian Authority: is taking steps to end acts of violence against U.S. and Israeli citizens perpetrated by individuals under its jurisdictional control, such as the March 2016 attack that killed former Army officer Taylor Force; is publicly condemning such acts of violence and is investigating, or cooperating in investigations of, such acts; and has terminated payments for acts of terrorism against U.S. and Israeli citizens to any individual who has been convicted and imprisoned for such acts, to any individual who died committing such acts, and to family members of such an individual.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taylor Force Act

Sponsors

Rep. Doug Lamborn [R]Rep. Lee Zeldin [R]Rep. Jeff Duncan [R]Rep. Randy Weber [R]
Rep. Glenn Grothman [R]Rep. Jackie Walorski [R]Rep. Mike Coffman [R]Rep. Pete Sessions [R]
Rep. Trent Franks [R]Rep. David McKinley [R]Rep. Mike Gallagher [R]Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R]
Rep. Alexander Mooney [R]Sen. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R]Rep. Tom McClintock [R]Rep. Bradley Byrne [R]
Rep. David Kustoff [R]Rep. Brian Babin [R]Rep. Blake Farenthold [R]Rep. Francis Rooney [R]
Rep. Joe Wilson [R]Rep. Marsha Blackburn [R]Rep. Todd Rokita [R]Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R]
Rep. Vern Buchanan [R]Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R]Rep. French Hill [R]Rep. Dennis Ross [R]
Rep. Claudia Tenney [R]Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R]Rep. Mark Meadows [R]Rep. Gregg Harper [R]
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R]Rep. Dave Brat [R]Rep. Steve Russell [R]Rep. Lamar Smith [R]
Rep. David Valadao [R]Rep. Keith Rothfus [R]Rep. David Young [R]Rep. Ryan Costello [R]
Rep. Don Bacon [R]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R]Rep. Doug Collins [R]Rep. Tim Murphy [R]
Rep. Lou Barletta [R]Rep. Kenny Marchant [R]Rep. Mike Bost [R]Rep. Steve Chabot [R]
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R]Rep. Ken Calvert [R]Rep. Michael Burgess [R]Rep. Jason Smith [R]
Rep. Ron DeSantis [R]Rep. James Renacci [R]Rep. Louie Gohmert [R]Rep. David Trott [R]
Rep. Ted Poe [R]Rep. Peter Roskam [R]Rep. David Schweikert [R]Rep. Tom Marino [R]
Rep. Steve Stivers [R]Rep. Leonard Lance [R]Rep. Daniel Webster [R]Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R]
Rep. Scott Tipton [R]Rep. Luke Messer [R]Rep. Mike Bishop [R]Rep. Earl Carter [R]
Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R]Rep. Thomas Garrett [R]Rep. John Culberson [R]Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R]
Rep. Gary Palmer [R]Rep. Michael McCaul [R]Rep. Erik Paulsen [R]Rep. Jeff Denham [R]
Rep. Kevin Yoder [R]Rep. Robert Pittenger [R]Rep. Jim Jordan [R]Rep. Kevin Cramer [R]
Rep. Markwayne Mullin [R]Rep. Jody Hice [R]Rep. Steven Palazzo [R]Rep. Stephen Knight [R]
Rep. Mark Walker [R]Rep. Neal Dunn [R]Rep. Roger Williams [R]Rep. Duncan Hunter [R]
Rep. Evan Jenkins [R]Rep. Greg Walden [R]Rep. Kristi Noem [R]Rep. Tim Walberg [R]
Rep. Billy Long [R]Rep. Christopher Smith [R]Rep. Mark Amodei [R]Rep. Tom Rice [R]
Rep. Steve King [R]Rep. Scott Perry [R]Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R]Rep. Barbara Comstock [R]
Rep. Bill Johnson [R]Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R]Rep. John Faso [R]Rep. Jody Arrington [R]
Rep. Patrick Meehan [R]Rep. Stevan Pearce [R]Rep. Daniel Donovan [R]Rep. Kevin Brady [R]
Rep. Larry Bucshon [R]Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R]Rep. Mimi Walters [R]Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R]
Rep. John Ratcliffe [R]Rep. Walter Jones [R]Rep. Mac Thornberry [R]Rep. Ted Yoho [R]
Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R]Rep. Karen Handel [R]Rep. Jim Banks [R]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R]
Rep. Tom Emmer [R]Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R]Rep. Ralph Abraham [R]Rep. Rod Blum [R]
Rep. John Katko [R]Rep. David Roe [R]Rep. Bill Flores [R]Rep. Trent Kelly [R]
Rep. Robert Wittman [R]Rep. Bob Gibbs [R]Rep. James Comer [R]Rep. David Rouzer [R]
Rep. George Holding [R]Rep. Michael Turner [R]Rep. Austin Scott [R]Rep. Paul Gosar [R]
Rep. Brian Mast [R]Rep. Ralph Norman [R]Rep. Tom Graves [R]Rep. Rick Allen [R]
Rep. Drew Ferguson [R]Rep. Patrick McHenry [R]Rep. Don Young [R]Rep. Ted Budd [R]
Rep. Will Hurd [R]Rep. Paul Cook [R]Rep. Susan Brooks [R]Rep. Martha McSally [R]
Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R]Rep. David Joyce [R]Rep. Kay Granger [R]Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R]
Rep. Ann Wagner [R]Rep. Edward Royce [R]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D]Rep. Eliot Engel [D]
Rep. Grace Meng [D]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D]Rep. Lois Frankel [D]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D]
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D]
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D]Rep. Andy Harris [R]Rep. Mike Johnson [R]
Rep. Donald McEachin [D]Rep. Frank Pallone [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-07SenateRead twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 278.
2017-12-06SenateReceived in the Senate.
2017-12-05HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-12-05HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9648-9649)
2017-12-05HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1164.
2017-12-05HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9648-9653)
2017-12-05HouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2017-11-15HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2017-11-15HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-02-16HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2017-02-16HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB474 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB1697 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 211.
HB1625 (Related) 2018-03-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-141.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback