US HB1161 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Abraham Lincoln National Heritage Area Amendment Act This bill amends the Consolidated Natural Resources Act of 2008 to add Livingston County, the city of Jonesboro in Union County, and the city of Freeport in Stephenson County in Illinois to the Abraham Lincoln National Heritage Area.
Title
Abraham Lincoln National Heritage Area Amendment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] |
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] | Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] | Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] |
Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1160 (Related) 2018-04-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 372.
SB1460 (Related) 2017-09-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
SB1460 (Related) 2017-09-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Subjects
Historic sites and heritage areas
Illinois
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public lands and natural resources
U.S. history
Illinois
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public lands and natural resources
U.S. history
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1161/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1161/BILLS-115hr1161ih.pdf |