US HB1158 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 113.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DHS Cyber Incident Response Teams Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS Cyber Incident Response Teams Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 113.
2019-06-10HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-06-10HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4367)
2019-06-10HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1158.
2019-06-10HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4367-4369)
2019-06-10HouseMiss Rice (NY) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-05-30HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 64.
2019-05-30HouseReported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-89.
2019-05-15HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2019-05-15HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-15HouseSubcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation Discharged.
2019-03-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation.
2019-02-13HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB315 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 62.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback