US HB1156 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Assistant Secretary of Commerce for Communications and Information to report to Congress every 60 days on barriers to implementation by the Department of Interior and Department of Agriculture of an online portal to accept, process, and dispose of an application for the placement of communications facilities on certain Federal lands.
Title
Facilitating DIGITAL Applications Act Facilitating the Deployment of Infrastructure with Greater Internet Transactions And Legacy Applications Act
Sponsors
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3370 (Related) 2021-07-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1156/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1156/BILLS-117hr1156ih.pdf |