US HB1155 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 77-38)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Imposes various restrictions related to China's Xinjiang Uyghur Autonomous Region, including by prohibiting certain imports from Xinjiang and imposing sanctions on those responsible for human rights violations there. Goods manufactured or produced in Xinjiang shall not be entitled to entry into the United States unless U.S. Customs and Border Protection (1) determines that the goods were not manufactured by convict labor, forced labor, or indentured labor under penal sanctions; and (2) reports such a determination to Congress and to the public. The President shall periodically report to Congress a list of foreign entities and individuals knowingly facilitating (1) the forced labor of Uyghurs, Kazakhs, Kyrgyz, and members of other Muslim minority groups in Xinjiang; and (2) efforts to contravene U.S. laws regarding the importation of forced labor goods from Xinjiang. The President shall impose property-blocking sanctions on the listed individuals and entities and impose visa-blocking sanctions on the listed individuals. Securities issuers required to file annual or quarterly reports with the Securities Exchange Commission shall disclose in such reports instances in which the issuer knowingly engaged in certain activities related to Xinjiang, such as working with an entity building detention facilities or surveillance systems there. After such a disclosure, the President shall determine whether to investigate if sanctions or criminal charges are warranted. The Forced Labor Enforcement Task Force and the Department of State shall report to Congress strategies to address forced labor in Xinjiang or any other part of China. The State Department shall also report to Congress a determination of whether the treatment of Muslim groups in Xinjiang constitutes crimes against humanity or genocide under U.S. law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uyghur Forced Labor Prevention Act Uyghur Forced Labor Prevention Act

Sponsors

Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]
Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX]
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]
Rep. Young Kim [R-CA]Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. Carlos Gimenez [R-FL]Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX]
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ]
Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX]
Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Mark Green [R-TN]
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Ronny Jackson [R-TX]Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]
Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT]
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]
Rep. Ritchie Torres [D-NY]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA]Rep. Kaialii Kahele [D-HI]Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA]
Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]
Rep. John Curtis [R-UT]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Sara Jacobs [D-CA]Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL]
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT]Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Tom Tiffany [R-WI]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]
Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Blake Moore [R-UT]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Ernest Gonzales [R-TX]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]
Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]Rep. Robert Good [R-VA]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL]
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]

Roll Calls

2021-12-08 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 428 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-08HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-12-08HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 428 - 1 (Roll no. 412). (text: CR H7495-7498)
2021-12-08HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7533)
2021-12-08HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-12-08HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1155.
2021-12-08HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7495-7504)
2021-12-08HouseMr. Meeks moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2021-04-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2021-04-21HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2021-04-21HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-02-18HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-02-18HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-02-18HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-02-18HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-02-18HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
2021-02-18HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB3524 (Related) 2021-07-15 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 22.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback