US HB1150 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 77-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tanning Tax Repeal Act of 2017 This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to repeal the 10% excise tax on indoor tanning services.
Title
Tanning Tax Repeal Act of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1628 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 120.
SB1880 (Related) 2017-09-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2600 (Related) 2018-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1880 (Related) 2017-09-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2600 (Related) 2018-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1150/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1150/BILLS-115hr1150ih.pdf |