US HB1146 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 154-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 14.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Arctic Cultural and Coastal Plain Protection Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Arctic Cultural and Coastal Plain Protection Act

Sponsors

Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]
Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]
Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]
Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]
Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]
Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]
Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]
Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]
Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]
Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]
Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]
Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]Rep. David Price [D-NC]
Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]
Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]
Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 14.
2019-05-01HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-01HouseSubcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
2019-03-26HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-03-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
2019-02-11HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-02-11HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback