US HB114 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To adjust the boundary of the Fort Frederica National Monument in the State of Georgia, and for other purposes. This bill expands the boundary of the Fort Frederica National Monument on St. Simons Island, Georgia, and increases the maximum number of acres that may be included in the monument from 250 to 305 acres.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To adjust the boundary of the Fort Frederica National Monument in the State of Georgia, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2019-01-03HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9.
SB89 (Related) 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback