US HB1138 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-03 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To reauthorize the West Valley demonstration project, and for other purposes. This bill reauthorizes through FY2026 the West Valley Demonstration Project located in West Valley, New York. The Government Accountability Office must report to Congress on the volumes, origins, and types of radioactive waste at the West Valley Demonstration Project and the options for disposal of such waste.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To reauthorize the West Valley demonstration project, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-03SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-12-02SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6790)
2019-08-16SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 171.
2019-08-16SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2019 without amendment. With written report No. 116-69.
2019-07-16SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-07-09SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held.
2019-03-06SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2019-03-05HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-03-05HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2330-2331)
2019-03-05HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1138.
2019-03-05HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2330-2332)
2019-03-05HouseMr. Tonko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-02-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
2019-02-11HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-02-11HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback