US HB1133 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 87-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

VA Employee Fairness Act of 2019 This bill repeals provisions excluding any matter or question concerning professional conduct or competence; peer review; or the establishment, determination, or adjustment of employee compensation from the applicability of collective bargaining rights for Veterans Health Administration employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VA Employee Fairness Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]
Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]
Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]
Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]
Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]
Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-03-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
2019-02-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-02-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB462 (Related) 2019-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback