US HB1132 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides support for the protection and restoration of the San Francisco Bay estuary and the recovery of certain species in the estuary. Specifically, it establishes a San Francisco Bay Program Office in the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA). In addition, the EPA must annually compile a list of funding priorities for projects or studies that advance the goals and objectives of the comprehensive conservation and management plan approved under the National Estuary Program for the San Francisco Bay estuary. The list must include projects or studies for (1) water quality improvement; (2) wetland, riverine, and estuary restoration and protection; (3) nearshore and endangered species recovery; and (4) adaptation to climate change. The EPA may provide funding through grants or other means for studies or projects on the priority list.
Title
San Francisco Bay Restoration Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Nancy Pelosi [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2020-02-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-02-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H785-786) |
2020-02-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1132. |
2020-02-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H785-788) |
2020-02-05 | House | Mrs. Napolitano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-11-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 245. |
2019-11-20 | House | Committee on the Budget discharged. |
2019-11-20 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-304, Part I. |
2019-09-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-09-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-19 | House | Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3591 (Related) 2020-11-09 - An errata sheet on written report No. 116-288 was printed.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Air quality
Budget process
California
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Water quality
Watersheds
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Budget process
California
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Water quality
Watersheds
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection