US HB1130 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-21 - Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 712 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4365, H.R. 1130 and H. Res. 684. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 4365, under a structured rule; H.R. 1130, under a structured rule; and H.Res. 684, under a closed rule. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on all three bills.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-21 - Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 712 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4365, H.R. 1130 and H. Res. 684. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 4365, under a structured rule; H.R. 1130, under a structured rule; and H.Res. 684, under a closed rule. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on all three bills.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To repeal restrictions on the export and import of natural gas.
Title
Unlocking our Domestic LNG Potential Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Mike Garcia [R-CA] |
Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-21 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 712 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4365, H.R. 1130 and H. Res. 684. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 4365, under a structured rule; H.R. 1130, under a structured rule; and H.Res. 684, under a closed rule. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on all three bills. |
2023-09-19 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 699 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1130, H. Res. 684 and H.R. 5525. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1130, under a structured rule; H.Res. 684, under a closed rule; and H.R. 5525, under a closed rule. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on all three bills. |
2023-03-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 11. |
2023-03-23 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-18. |
2023-03-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 21. |
2023-03-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-02-28 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 9 . |
2023-02-28 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security. |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB647 (Same As) 2023-02-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security.
HB1 (Related) 2023-03-30 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 1.
SB947 (Related) 2023-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2811 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Committee on the Budget. Hearings held.
HR699 (Related) 2023-10-03 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 756, H. Res. 699 is laid on the table.
HR712 (Related) 2023-09-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB7176 (Related) 2024-02-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1 (Related) 2023-03-30 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 1.
SB947 (Related) 2023-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2811 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Committee on the Budget. Hearings held.
HR699 (Related) 2023-10-03 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 756, H. Res. 699 is laid on the table.
HR712 (Related) 2023-09-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB7176 (Related) 2024-02-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.