US HB1126 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to provide inscriptions for deceased spouses and children on certain headstones furnished by the VA.
Title
Honoring Veterans’ Families Act
Sponsors
Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] |
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] |
Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] |
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] |
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2019-02-13 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1532-1533) |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2651 (Related) 2019-10-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB7952 (Related) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB7952 (Related) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Cemeteries and funerals
Family relationships
Marriage and family status
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Cemeteries and funerals
Family relationships
Marriage and family status
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' organizations and recognition
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1126/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1126/BILLS-116hr1126ih.pdf |