US HB1123 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Divisional Realignment for the Eastern District of Arkansas Act of 2019 This bill consolidates the five existing divisions in the Eastern District of Arkansas into three divisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Divisional Realignment for the Eastern District of Arkansas Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-08SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-11-07SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
2019-11-07SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6485)
2019-10-23SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-10-22HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-10-22HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8357-8358)
2019-10-22HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1123.
2019-10-22HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8357-8358)
2019-10-22HouseMr. Johnson (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-10-22HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 197.
2019-10-22HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-248.
2019-10-16HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2019-10-16HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-10-15HouseSubcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet Discharged.
2019-03-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
2019-02-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-02-08HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback