US HB1119 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
SENSE Act Satisfying Energy Needs and Saving the Environment Act (Sec. 2) This bill eases emission limits for hazardous air pollutants from electric utility steam generating units (electric power plants) that convert coal refuse into energy. The Environmental Protection Agency must allow utilities to select a standard for either hydrogen chloride or sulfur dioxide with which to comply from a list of specified standards.
Title
SENSE Act Satisfying Energy Needs and Saving the Environment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Rothfus [R-PA] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] |
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Tim Murphy [R-PA] | Rep. Bill Shuster [R-PA] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 100 (Y: 181 N: 225 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - House - On passage RC# 101 (Y: 215 N: 189 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - On passage RC# 101 (Y: 215 N: 189 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2018-03-08 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2018-03-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-03-08 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 215 - 189 (Roll no. 101). (text: CR H1481) |
2018-03-08 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 181 - 225 (Roll no. 100). |
2018-03-08 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. |
2018-03-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Kildee motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to prevent the underlying bill from applying to any coal refuse electric utility steam generating facility associated with air pollution. |
2018-03-08 | House | Mr. Kildee moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Energy and Commerce. (text: CR H1487) |
2018-03-08 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2018-03-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1119. |
2018-03-08 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1119 and H.R. 1917. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1119 and H.R. 1917 under closed rules. Each measure shall be debatable for one hour equally divided and controlled by the Chair and Ranking Member of the Committee on Energy and Commerce. The rule provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions on each measure. |
2018-03-08 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 762. (consideration: CR H1480-1489) |
2018-03-05 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 762 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1119 and H.R. 1917. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1119 and H.R. 1917 under closed rules. Each measure shall be debatable for one hour equally divided and controlled by the Chair and Ranking Member of the Committee on Energy and Commerce. The rule provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions on each measure. |
2018-01-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 384. |
2018-01-12 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-514. |
2017-12-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 31 - 23. |
2017-12-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-11-15 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 13 - 10 . |
2017-11-15 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-02-16 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1282-1283) |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR762 (Related) 2018-03-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Air quality
Coal
Electric power generation and transmission
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Solid waste and recycling
Air quality
Coal
Electric power generation and transmission
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Solid waste and recycling