US HB1107 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-07 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Pershing County Economic Development and Conservation Act This bill directs the Department of the Interior to conduct sales or exchanges of eligible lands in Pershing County, Nevada, identified as the "Checkerboard Lands Resolution Area." Interior and the county shall jointly select which parcels of eligible land to offer for sale or acre-for-acre exchange. For purposes of acre-for-acre exchanges, Interior shall identify management priority areas within the Checkerboard Lands Resolution Area, including those considered to be: greater sage-grouse habitat; part of an identified wildlife corridor or designated critical habitat; of value for outdoor recreation or public access for hunting, fishing, and other recreational purposes; of significant cultural, historic, ecological, or scenic value; or of value for improving federal land management. The bill prescribes requirements for the disposition of proceeds from the sales of lands. Interior shall offer for sale and convey to specified qualified entities, for fair market value, the remaining U.S. right, title, and interest in certain lands and interests in the county. Interior shall convey to the county, without consideration, Unionville Cemetery. The bill designates specified federal land in Nevada as components of the National Wilderness Preservation System. The bill releases specified wilderness study areas from further review for designation as wilderness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pershing County Economic Development and Conservation Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-07SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
2018-01-17SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2018-01-16HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-01-16HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H387-391)
2018-01-16HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1107.
2018-01-16HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H387-392)
2018-01-16HouseMr. Gianforte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2017-09-28HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 243.
2017-09-28HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-336.
2017-06-27HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2017-06-27HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-05-23HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2017-02-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-02-16HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-02-16HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB414 (Same As) 2018-10-02 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback