US HB1096 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 252.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 252.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Judgment Fund Transparency Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill requires the Department of the Treasury to disclose details regarding payments made from the Judgment Fund on or after January 1, 2016. (The Judgment Fund is a permanent and indefinite appropriation to pay judgments against the United States.) Unless the disclosure is prohibited by law or a court order, Treasury must disclose to the public on a website: the agency or entity whose actions gave rise to the claim or judgment, the plaintiff or claimant, the counsel for the plaintiff or claimant, the amount paid representing principal liability and any amounts paid representing any ancillary liability, a description of the facts that gave rise to the claim, the agency that submitted the claim, and any information available on reports generated by the Judgment Fund Payment Search administered by Treasury. If the payment is made to a foreign state, Treasury must also disclose: the method of payment; the currency denomination used for the payment; and the name and location of each financial institution owned or controlled by a foreign state or an agent of a foreign state through which the payment passed, from which the payment was withdrawn, or that is holding the payment. By January 1, 2018, and annually thereafter, Treasury must disclose on the website: (1) the total amounts paid from the fund during the preceding year; and (2) the amounts paid during the preceding year for attorney fees, interest, and for all other payments. No payments from the fund may be made to a state sponsor of terrorism or an organization that has been designated as a foreign terrorist organization under the Immigration and Nationality Act.
Title
Judgment Fund Transparency Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] |
Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] |
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 252. |
2017-10-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-348. |
2017-06-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-06-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB386 (Related) 2017-02-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB565 (Related) 2017-03-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB469 (Related) 2017-10-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB565 (Related) 2017-03-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB469 (Related) 2017-10-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Foreign and international banking
Government information and archives
Government liability
Government operations and politics
Terrorism
Government information and archives
Government liability
Government operations and politics
Terrorism