US HB1088 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 220.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

FIRST Act First Infantry Recognition of Sacrifice in Theater Act This bill authorizes the Society of the First Infantry Division to modify the First Division Monument located on federal land in Presidential Park, District of Columbia, to honor members of the First Infantry Division of the U.S. Army who died during U.S. operations, including Operation Desert Storm, Operation Iraqi Freedom, Operation New Dawn, and Operation Enduring Freedom. The First Infantry Division must provide the society with a list of names to be added to the monument. The Commemorative Works Act, which prohibits monuments to military units, shall not apply to this authorization. Federal funds may not be used to pay the society for the modification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIRST Act First Infantry Recognition of Sacrifice in Theater Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-08HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 220.
2019-11-08HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-275.
2019-06-19HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-06-19HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-06-19HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
2019-05-22HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-02-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2019-02-07HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-02-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB389 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback