US HB1078 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-2)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protects certain veterans of the Armed Forces from removal from the United States, and provides such veterans with an expedited procedure for naturalization. The bill applies to "special veterans," defined as persons who served in the active Armed Forces, who were (1) honorably discharged or released; (2) not convicted of various crimes, including voluntary manslaughter, murder, rape, or terrorism; and (3) not a child abuser or pedophile. Special veterans shall not be removed from the United States, and the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) shall cancel any pending removal proceedings or orders against any such veterans. DHS shall establish a program to permit such veterans who were already removed from the United States to return to as an alien with permanent residence status. Such veterans shall be entitled to all of the military benefits that they would be entitled to if they had never been removed from the United States. Special veterans shall be naturalized upon filing an application, paying the relevant fees, and taking an oath of allegiance. DHS shall take steps to ensure such naturalization applications are pending for no longer than 90 days.
Title
Repatriate Our Patriots Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Citizenship and naturalization
Foreign labor
Government information and archives
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Foreign labor
Government information and archives
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1078/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1078/BILLS-116hr1078ih.pdf |