US HB1076 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Fair Chance Act Fair Chance to Compete for Jobs Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fair Chance Act Fair Chance to Compete for Jobs Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-03-26HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2019-02-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, the Judiciary, Armed Services, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, the Judiciary, Armed Services, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, the Judiciary, Armed Services, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, the Judiciary, Armed Services, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, the Judiciary, Armed Services, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB387 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 69.
SB697 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1893 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback