US HB1075 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Became Public Law No: 114-16. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Became Public Law No: 114-16. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the United States Customs and Border Protection Port of Entry located at First Street and Pan American Avenue in Douglas, Arizona, as the "Raul Hector Castro Port of Entry". Designates the United States Customs and Border Protection Port of Entry located at First Street and Pan American Avenue in Douglas, Arizona, as the "Raul Hector Castro Port of Entry."
Title
To designate the United States Customs and Border Protection Port of Entry located at First Street and Pan American Avenue in Douglas, Arizona, as the "Raul Hector Castro Port of Entry".
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] |
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] |
Rep. Matt Salmon [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-16. (TXT | PDF) |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2814) |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2814) |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2015-04-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-04-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2481) |
2015-04-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1075. |
2015-04-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2481-2483) |
2015-04-28 | House | Mr. Ryan (WI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2015-03-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Arizona
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional tributes
Customs enforcement
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional tributes
Customs enforcement
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics