US HB1073 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

FAIR Act Federal Adjustment of Income Rates Act This bill increases by 3.6% the rates of basic pay for federal employees under the statutory pay systems (i.e., the General Schedule, the Foreign Service Schedule, and various schedules related to the Veterans Health Administration) for calendar year 2020. Additionally, it increases by 3.6% the rates of basic pay for prevailing rate employees for FY2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FAIR Act Federal Adjustment of Income Rates Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
2019-02-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB782 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HB790 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Received in the Senate.
SB262 (Related) 2019-01-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB426 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback